Stewart, John Alan (CPSO#: 51741)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 24 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012