Stewart, John Patrick (CPSO#: 56989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
1220 Prom Place d'Orleans
Suite 100
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone: (613) 841-5389
Fax: (613) 841-5393
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PATRICK STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1987