Stewart, Lindsay Catherine (CPSO#: 61234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karovitch Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Stewart ( CPSO# 61234 )
Dr. A. Karovitch ( CPSO# 63629 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-3533

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital
LM15 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY CATHERINE STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1991