Stewart, Lois Mabel (CPSO#: 61520)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 1990