Stewart, Lori Katherine (CPSO#: 65025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 43897
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Stewart ( CPSO# 65025 )

Business Address:
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI KATHERINE STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993