Stewart, Marilyn June (CPSO#: 62747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Drynan Way, Suite 1
Seeleys Bay
Seeleys Bay ON  K0H 2N0
Phone: 1-613-387-3120
Fax: 613-387-2842
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILYN JUNE STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1992