Stewart, Pamela Ann (CPSO#: 58003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH: Queen Street Site
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto ON  M6J 2H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 36687
Fax: (416) 583-1452
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pamela Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Stewart ( CPSO# 58003 )

Business Address:
CAMH: Queen Street Site
Suite 222
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA ANN STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 May 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1988