Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Stewart, Peter David (CPSO#: 25213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Michigan, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
Suite 100
1220 Promenade Place d'Orleans
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone: (613) 541-5389
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. David Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Stewart ( CPSO# 25213 )

Business Address:
St Laurent Medical Centre
968 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1K 3B3
Phone Number: (613) 789-4385

Business Address:
1220 Promenade Place d'Orleans
Suite 100
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER DAVID STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990