Stewart, Robert John (CPSO#: 59574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Urology
Suite 9111
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3686
Fax: (416) 867-3675
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 10 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008