Stewart, Robert Louis (CPSO#: 76128)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: Stewart, Robbie Louis (used until: 23 Apr 2006 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2006 to 26 May 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008