Stewart, Ronald Jay (CPSO#: 69939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
126 May Street South
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1B3
Phone: (807) 623-3929
Fax: (807) 622-5633
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: 8076846453
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lailey Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stewart ( CPSO# 69939 )
Dr. J. Lailey ( CPSO# 69949 )

Business Address:
126 May Street South
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1B3
Phone Number: (807) 623-3929

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 343-8361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jul 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD JAY STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2001