Stewart, Sheryl Evelyn (CPSO#: 70286)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jan 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2002