Stewart, Thomas Edward (CPSO#: 59550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Chief of Staff Office
1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 43119
Fax: (905) 704-4195
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Josephs Hamilton Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35001
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.E. Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Stewart ( CPSO# 59550 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS EDWARD STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1989