Stieb, David Michael (CPSO#: 58461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
445-757 West Hastings St.
Federal Tower
Vancouver BC  V6C 1A1
Phone: (604) 666-3701
Fax: (604) 666-5741

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL STIEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STIEB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988