Stiglick, Amanda Jennifer (CPSO#: 88635)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013