Stiller, Gabriele (CPSO#: 25854)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003