Stimac, John Michael (CPSO#: 51739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 507
304 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G4
Phone: (905) 966-0880
Fax: (888) 737-7082
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Stimac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stimac ( CPSO# 51739 )

Business Address:
507 - 304 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL STIMAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STIMAC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1985