Stingu-Baxter, Miroslava (CPSO#: 99623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian, Russian

Education:N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
70 Colony Farm Road
Forensic Psychiatric Hospital
Coquitlam BC  V3C 5X9
Phone: (604) 524-7716

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIROSLAVA STINGU-BAXTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STINGU-BAXTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 26 Nov 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2014