Stinson, Jan Michelle (CPSO#: 54444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suites 2C and 3G
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 662-3303
Fax: (905) 662-3304
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

180 Vine Street South, Suite 306
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-662-3303
Fax: 905-662-3304
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

414 Victoria Ave N, Suite M6
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Canada
Phone: 905-662-3303
Fax: 905-662-3304
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2951 Walkers Line, 3rd Floor
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Canada
Phone: 905-662-3303
Fax: 906-662-3304
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.M. Stinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Whittier ( CPSO# 52085 )
Dr. J. Stinson ( CPSO# 54444 )

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAN MICHELLE STINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1985