Stirling, Denise Susan (CPSO#: 62576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Trafalgar Road
Suite 318
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 849-1322
Fax: (905) 849-1323
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISE SUSAN STIRLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STIRLING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1991