Stirling, Michael John (CPSO#: 75217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone: (705) 848-7181
Fax: (705) 848-9006
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stirling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stirling ( CPSO# 75217 )

Business Address:
525 Causley Street
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 261-2805

Business Address:
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 261-2805

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (705) 848-7181

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Shore Health Network Blind River
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN STIRLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STIRLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005