Stiver, Shirley Irene (CPSO#: 60773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Lombard St.
San Francisco CA  94111
United States
Phone: (415) 519-2871

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRLEY IRENE STIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STIVER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 1995 to 15 Mar 1996
Resident 6 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991