Stobbe, Karl Edward (CPSO#: 51738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Shaver Health &
Rehabilitation Centre
541 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone: (905) 685-1381
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karl Stobbe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Stobbe ( CPSO# 51738 )

Business Address:
340 Elgin Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 6G9

Business Address:
541 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone Number: (905) 685-1381

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARL EDWARD STOBBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOBBE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1984