Stobo, Reginald Benjamin (CPSO#: 58380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Athens District Family
Health Team
P O Box 99
9 Wellington Street
Athens ON  K0E 1B0
Phone: (613) 924-2623 Ext. ext 224
Fax: (613) 924-2276
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Benjamin Stobo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stobo ( CPSO# 58380 )

Business Address:
Athens District Family Health Team
9 Wellington Street
Athens ON  K0E 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 924-2623

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REGINALD BENJAMIN STOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOBO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1988