Stockall, Carol Ann (CPSO#: 51237)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: Moote, Carol Ann Stockall (used until: 08 Oct 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Mar 2005