Stoessl, Alexander Jonathan (CPSO#: 51775)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1997