Stoica, John (CPSO#: 29661)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: Stoicoviciu, Mircea Ion Romulus (used until: 29 Sep 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hungarian, Italian, Romanian

Education:Regele Ferdinand I University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Dec 2009