Stolee, Kathrine Joan (CPSO#: 57403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth and Smiths Falls
District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 267-6777
Fax: (613) 267-6559
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathrine Stolee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Stolee ( CPSO# 57403 )

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls
District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-6777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRINE JOAN STOLEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOLEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1987