Stoltz, Katherine Janet (CPSO#: 56965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 12
277 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 2P7
Phone: (905) 688-1037
Fax: (905) 688-3988
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5845 Ferry St
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 1S5
Canada
Phone: (905) 357-3644
Fax: (905) 357-9230
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Stoltz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Stoltz ( CPSO# 56965 )

Business Address:
5845 Ferry Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 1S8
Phone Number: (905) 357-3644

Business Address:
12 - 277 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 688-1037

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE JANET STOLTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOLTZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1988