Stone, Pamela Jane (CPSO#: 54027)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: Sorbie, Pamela Jane (used until: 04 Jan 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Sep 1999