Stone, Susan Joan (CPSO#: 30184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1978

Summary

Former Name: Stone, Susan Van Steenburgh (used until: 11 May 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Seaton House
339 George Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2N2
Phone: (416) 338-3187
Fax: (416) 392-6616
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Robertson House
291 Sherbourne St.
Toronto ON  M5A 2R9
Canada
Phone: (416) 392-5780
Fax: (416) 392-3897
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Stone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Stone ( CPSO# 30184 )

Business Address:
Seaton House
339 George Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 338-3187

Business Address:
Robertson House
291 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2R9
Phone Number: (416) 392-5662

Business Address:
Birchmount Residence
1673 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1N 1S6
Phone Number: (416) 392-5797

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN JOAN STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1978