Stong, Martha Marie Josephine (CPSO#: 65538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
119 Memorial Avenue
Suite 103
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 326-3549
Fax: (705) 326-9529
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTHA MARIE JOSEPHINE STONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Aug 1994 to 18 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993