Storey, David George Welland (CPSO#: 51824)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2009