Storkson, Katharine Dawn (CPSO#: 101025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1234
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Elevate NWO
106 Cumberland St. N
Thunder Bay, ON
P7A 4M2
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: 807-345-1516
Fax: 807-345-2505
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

TBRHSC
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: 807-684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Storkson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Storkson ( CPSO# 101025)

Business Address:
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHARINE DAWN STORKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STORKSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015