Storring, John Marlin (CPSO#: 82382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McGill University Health Centre
Glen Site
Room D02-7048
1001 Boulevard Decarie
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 31558
Fax: (514) 843-1418

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MARLIN STORRING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STORRING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2005