Story, Eden Sarah (CPSO#: 91019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital Eastern Ontario
Department of Hematology & Oncology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDEN SARAH STORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STORY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013