Stoski, Douglas Michael (CPSO#: 66366)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2003