Stothart, Tonja Lee (CPSO#: 72411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4710
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tonja Stothart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Stothart ( CPSO# 72411 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Mar 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TONJA LEE STOTHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOTHART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 10 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 10 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004