Stotland, Peter Kenneth (CPSO#: 77983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (647) 258-9960
Fax: (647) 258-9965
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Stotland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Stotland ( CPSO# 77983 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (647) 258-9960

Business Address:
Room T2 - 057
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
2111 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 1N1
Phone Number: (416) 744-2500

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER KENNETH STOTLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOTLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007