Stoyka, William Wasily (CPSO#: 21229)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 31, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. William Wasily Stoyka to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I, Dr. William Wasily Stoyka:

(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (the “Investigation”) by the College regarding whether I maintained the standard of practice of the profession and whether I am incompetent in the practice of medicine.

(3) Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation.

(4) Acknowledge that I entered into an Undertaking dated April 24, 2013 (my “Previous Undertaking”), which was accepted in resolution of the Investigation, but that since that time I have not complied with the professional education obligations set out in my Previous Undertaking at paragraph B(5) thereof. I further acknowledge that I did not commence the clinical supervision contemplated by paragraph B(4) of my Previous Undertaking, and as a consequence have ceased to practise medicine.

(5) Hereby resign from the College effective March 31, 2014 (the “Effective Date”).

(6) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

(7) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have applied or re-applied for registration to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and/or my Previous Undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to re-commence the Investigation.

(13) Acknowledge that the terms of this undertaking will be entered on the register as information that is available to the public.