Strachan, Peter George (CPSO#: 19492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1965

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1965

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter G. Strachan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 04 Jan 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GEORGE STRACHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRACHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1965