Strang, John Douglas (CPSO#: 63719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-3437
Fax: (905) 336-9627
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS STRANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992

Pending Hearings

Summary: Dr. John Douglas Strang (June 13, 2017) Allegations of Dr. Strang’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Strang engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to comply in a timely manner or at all with the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee decision of August 17, 2016 requiring he complete a specified continuing education or remediation program.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)