Strasberg, Jessica Elizabeth (CPSO#: 82424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-1499 Gordon Drive
Kelowna BC  V1Y 9R2
Phone: (250) 762-3807
Fax: (250) 763-6263

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA ELIZABETH STRASBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRASBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 29 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007