Strasberg, Steven Martin (CPSO#: 19277)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Oct 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2000