Strasburg, Kate (CPSO#: 88428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416 530-6000 Ext. 4637
Fax: 416 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Strasburg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Strasburg ( CPSO# 88428 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATE STRASBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRASBURG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015