Strasser, Roger Peter (CPSO#: 53525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Ontario Scool of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone: (750) 671-3874
Fax: (705) 671-3830
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Northern Ontario School of Medicine
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Canada
Phone: (807) 766-7448
Fax: (807) 766-7369
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER PETER STRASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRASSER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Sep 1985
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2002
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Sep 2005