Strasser, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 53628)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 50 Holland Street Greenslopes Brisbane Australia
Date Received: 31 Jul 2017

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Nov 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Sep 1985
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2003
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Sep 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2017