Straszak-Suri, Marina Anna (CPSO#: 57056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: Straszak, Marina Anna (used until: 24 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106 Centrepointe Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6B1
Phone: (613) 224-4135
Fax: (613) 224-7228
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P & M Suri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suri ( CPSO# 57082 )
Dr. M. Straszak-Suri ( CPSO# 57056 )

Business Address:
106 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6B1
Phone Number: (613) 224-6157

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARINA ANNA STRASZAK-SURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRASZAK-SURI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1991 to 31 Jul 1992
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987