Stratford, Philip Arthur Talbot (CPSO#: 65526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
316 King Street East
Cobourg ON  K9A 5R8
Phone: (905) 373-1280
Fax: (905) 373-9335
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Stratford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Stratford ( CPSO# 65526 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
316 King Street East
Cobourg ON  K9A 5R8
Phone Number: (905) 373-1280

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP ARTHUR TALBOT STRATFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRATFORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993