Stratmann, Hanka Helena Elsbeth Antoinette (CPSO#: 78019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 2
4000 hwy 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 8Z2
Phone: (905) 851-3777
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

51 Mountainash road, unit 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

3530 derry road east
Malton ON  L4R 4E3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hanka Stratmann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Stratmann ( CPSO# 78019 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
4000 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 8Z2
Phone Number: (905) 858-1363

Business Address:
10 - 25 Woodbine Down Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Phone Number: (416) 741-2273

Business Address:
Springdale Mall
8 - 51 Mountainash Road East
Brampton ON  L6B 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 799-2722

Business Address:
Suite 110
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 672-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jan 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANKA HELENA ELSBETH ANTOINETTE STRATMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRATMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Apr 2005 to 18 May 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2005